California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1777 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022