|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 951, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5104.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
From Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4258.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|