|
07/01/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4266.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4521.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|