|
09/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 323, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4871.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2022
|
6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4577.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|