|
09/27/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 20.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5180.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on ED.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|