California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1810 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill March 30, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022