Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2022 | Read first time. To print. |