Assembly | 10/24/2022 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2022 | Read first time. To print. |