Senate | 08/11/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4215.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 30). | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2022 | Read first time. To print. |