|
07/21/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 141, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4432.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4214.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|