California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1851 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill June 15, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022