California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1855 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 16, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 15, 2022
Bill June 6, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022