06/21/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/16/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4130.). | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31). | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3916.) | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 15). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2022 | Read first time. To print. |