California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1871 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 20, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022