California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1882 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 4, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022