Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4436.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|