|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 14.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5075.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 4569.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|