California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1902 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 8, 2022
Bill June 29, 2022
Bill June 9, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022