|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5004.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4882.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Rubio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4872.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|