Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|