Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2022 | Read first time. To print. |