California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1931 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022