Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4910.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|