California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1938 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022