Senate | 06/22/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 12.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2022 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4908.) | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Read first time. To print. |