Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Read first time. To print. |