Assembly | 06/21/2022 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2022 | Vetoed by Governor. | ||
06/16/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4129.). | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 31). | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4215.) | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 30). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Read first time. To print. |