California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2022

Amended

Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 15, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022