California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1985 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2022

Amended

Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022