Assembly | 05/25/2022 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bauer-Kahan. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2022 | From inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2022 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Bauer-Kahan. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and E.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Read first time. To print. |