Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Read first time. To print. |