LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1993
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1993
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1993
Action History
Assembly
04/18/2022
Coauthors revised.
Assembly
03/29/2022
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
03/17/2022
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
Assembly
02/11/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
Assembly
02/10/2022
Read first time. To print.