California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1999 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Amended

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022