California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill June 9, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022