|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 5128.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
6-23-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-22-2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 5. Page 4611.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|