Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4681.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5035.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|