Assembly | 10/24/2022 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2022 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2022 | Read first time. To print. |