California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Amended

Bill June 16, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022