California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill August 2, 2022
Bill June 1, 2022
Bill March 11, 2022