Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 514.) | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2021 | Introduced. To print. |