Assembly | 04/04/2022 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2022 | Read first time. To print. |