|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 485, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Measure version as amended on August 11 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5055.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4739.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4938.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4938.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|