California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2069 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022