Senate | 08/11/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2022 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5014.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2022 | Read first time. To print. |