Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2022 | Read first time. To print. |