|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 649, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5206.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4612.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|