|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 459, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 5199.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 20.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4738.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|