Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4911.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|