Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 7. Page 4573.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|