Assembly | 04/20/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. To print. |